UNITED STATES
SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Washington, D.C. 20549
FORM 8-K
CURRENT REPORT
Pursuant to Section 13 or 15(d)
of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934
Date of Report (Date of earliest event reported): October 5, 2015
Tops Holding II Corporation
(Exact name of registrant as specified in its charter)
Delaware | 333-191029 | 46-2733709 | ||
(State or other jurisdiction of incorporation or organization) |
(Commission File Number) |
(I.R.S. Employer Identification No.) |
6363 Main Street Williamsville, New York |
14221 | |
(Address of principal executive offices) | (Zip Code) |
Registrants telephone number, including area code: (716) 635-5000
Not Applicable
(Former name or former address, if changed since last report)
Check the appropriate box below if the Form 8-K filing is intended to simultaneously satisfy the filing obligation of the registrant under any of the following provisions:
¨ | Written communications pursuant to Rule 425 under the Securities Act (17 CFR 230.425) |
¨ | Soliciting material pursuant to Rule 14a-12 under the Exchange Act (17 CFR 240.14a-12) |
¨ | Pre-commencement communications pursuant to Rule 14d-2(b) under the Exchange Act (17 CFR 240.14d-2(b)) |
¨ | Pre-commencement communications pursuant to Rule 13e-4(c) under the Exchange Act (17 CFR 240.13e-4(c)) |
Item 5.02 | Departure of Directors or Certain Officers; Election of Directors; Appointment of Certain Officers; Compensatory Arrangements of Certain Officers. |
On October 5, 2015, Tops Holding II Corporation (the Company) appointed John Persons, age 48, as its President and Chief Operating Officer. Mr. Persons had been serving as the Companys Executive Vice President, Sales, Marketing and Merchandising since January 1, 2015, and prior to that as the Companys Senior Vice President of Retail Operations since December 2007. Mr. Persons has been employed at the Company for over 30 years.
In connection with Mr. Persons appointment, Frank Curci will relinquish the office of President of the Company. Mr. Curci will continue as the Companys Chief Executive Officer and Chairman.
On October 5, 2015, the Company appointed Kevin Darrington, the Companys former Chief Operating Officer, as Executive Vice President, Supply Chain and Information Technology. Mr. Darrington will oversee the Companys information technology and distribution systems, including the Companys warehouse distribution facility in Lancaster, NY.
On October 5, 2015, Lynne Burgess notified the Company that it is her intention to resign from her current position as Executive Vice President and General Counsel of the Company effective December 31, 2015. Following the effective date of her resignation, Ms. Burgess has agreed to serve as special counsel to the Company. Ms. Burgess will continue to serve on the Companys board of directors.
SIGNATURES
Pursuant to the requirements of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934, the registrant has duly caused this report to be signed on its behalf by the undersigned hereunto duly authorized.
TOPS HOLDING II CORPORATION | ||||||
Date: October 6, 2015 | ||||||
By: | /s/ Frank Curci | |||||
Frank Curci | ||||||
Chief Executive Officer |